THE FREDERICK WIGAN TRUST

Charity number: 249614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £19.99k £19.59k £21.95k £19.03k £13.42k
Total expenditure £10.24k £17.97k £15.53k £12.31k £13.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A