INTERNATIONAL LAW ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 249637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 December 2019 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 December 2019 53 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 May 2017 On time Download