Financial history INTERNATIONAL LAW ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 249637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £138.52k £157.39k £142.16k £198.88k £139.49k
Total expenditure £141.47k £172.39k £146.74k £134.39k £110.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A