THE HUDDERSFIELD PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity (249661) were transferred to the new charity (1114413) on 13 June 2006. Bank details are as existed to that date.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Kirklees
Governance
- 22 November 1966: Standard registration
- 17 January 2008: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 17 January 2008: Funds transferred to 1114413 THE HUDDERSFIELD PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY
- HUDDERSFIELD PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | 30/04/2005 | 30/04/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.61k | £34.22k | £27.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.86k | £33.49k | £35.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | 09 February 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | 09 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | 20 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | 20 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 01 February 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | 01 February 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 7 MAY 1946 AND AMENDED 28 MAY 1957 AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 1988
Charitable objects
TO FORM AND MAINTAIN AN ORCHESTRA IN ORDER TO PROMOTE THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF ORCHESTRAL WORKS BY WAY OF CONCERTS IN HUDDERSFIELD, OR AS OTHERWISE DECIDED FROM TIME TO TIME, AND SO THAT THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE CONFINED TO CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY ACCORDING TO THE LEGAL MEANING OF THAT TERM.
Area of benefit
HUDDERSFIELD AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window