Accounts and annual returns THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window