Trustees THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

31 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Irvin Stansbury Trustee 04 March 2020
None on record
Joseph Ahosu Goswell Trustee 29 November 2019
GOOD SHEPHERD MISSION HALL CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Katie Jane Thomas Trustee 22 January 2019
THE KOREAN MISSION
Received: On time
Solabomi Anike Ogun Trustee 18 December 2018
None on record
David Richard Beamish Trustee 18 December 2018
THE DULWICH SOCIETY
Received: On time
HANSARD SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: 1 day late
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DULWICH, ST BARNABAS
Received: On time
Rebecca Justine Chapman Trustee 18 December 2018
THE CHURCH AND MEDIA NETWORK
Received: On time
Vasanthini Berla Kirubaibai Gnanadoss Trustee 18 December 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BATTERSEA FIELDS
Received: On time
Colin Richard Plant Trustee 18 December 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER BROCKLEY
Received: On time
Despina Francois Trustee 18 December 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SYDENHAM AND FOREST HILL, HOLY TRINITY
Recently registered
Rev Jonathan Edward Gordon macy Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
Rev Leslie John Wells Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
Rev GREGORY STEPHEN PRIOR Trustee 05 December 2018
CHURCH ESTATES CHARITY
Received: On time
Putney United Gospel Society
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS WITH HOLY TRINITY, WANDSWORTH
Received: On time
WANDSWORTH COMBINED CHARITY
Received: On time
Alan George Saunders Trustee 01 July 2018
RICHMOND CHURCH CHARITY ESTATES
Received: On time
PHILIP JOHN FLETCHER Trustee 10 March 2018
None on record
Rt Revd Dr WOYIN KAROWEI DORGU Trustee 17 March 2017
THE NIGERIAN CHAPLAINCY
Received: On time
TOGETHER SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
THE JOSHUA DORGU FOUNDATION
Received: On time
The Venerable Moira Anne Elizabeth Astin Trustee 30 October 2016
REGINALD BAKER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
COLLEGE OF ST BARNABAS
Received: On time
SPARKFISH
Received: On time
SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN WELCARE
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL LAW SOCIETY
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Jonathan Dunnett Clark Trustee 28 November 2015
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
Ven John Kiddle Trustee 28 November 2015
None on record
Lotwina Sarudzayi Farodoye Trustee 28 November 2015
None on record
Bill Bishop Trustee 28 November 2015
None on record
Mr Alex Helliwell Trustee 28 November 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, CARSHALTON
Received: On time
MICHAEL ROBERT HARTLEY Trustee 28 November 2015
THE TISBURY TELEGRAPH TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY MAGDALENE CHURCH, PECKHAM
Received: On time
Concordia Chamber Choir
Received: On time
Dr David Clifton Keiller Trustee 28 November 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, REDHILL
Received: On time
Venerable Dr MARLENE ROSEMARIE MALLETT Trustee 28 November 2015
BIG LOCAL IMPACT
TOGETHER SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
JACQUELINE SARAH DEAN Trustee 28 November 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH - BROCKHAM GREEN
Received: On time
Adrian Greenwood Trustee 28 November 2015
LINK AGE SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. JAMES WITH CHRISTCHURCH AND ST. CRISPIN, BERMONDSEY
Received: 50 days late
THE INASMUCH TRUST
Received: 52 days late
TOGETHER SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
ST JAMES' BERMONDSEY ORGAN RESTORATION FUND
Received: On time
Dr NICHOLAS JOHN BURT Trustee 28 November 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES WEST STREATHAM SOUTHWARK
Received: On time
FURZEDOWN CHURCHES LTD
Received: On time
RT REVD DR RICHARD IAN CHEETHAM Trustee 28 November 2015
THE BISHOP OF SOUTHWARK'S LENT FUND
Received: On time
The Venerable SIMON PHILIP GATES Trustee 04 September 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET THE QUEEN, STREATHAM HILL
Received: On time
The Venerable Alastair Murray Cutting Trustee 15 May 2013
ACG LIMITED
FULCRUM-ANGLICAN
Received: On time
THAMESMEAD CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY LIMITED
Received: On time
The Right Reverend Christopher Thomas James Chessun Trustee 27 September 2011
BACON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE EASTERBROOK THORLEY SCHOLARSHIP ICW THE BOUTCHER SCHOOLS
Received: On time
KENNINGTON OVAL NATIONAL SCHOOL (NOW KNOWN AS LAMBETH, ST MARK'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: On time
THE WINTER EXHIBITION
Received: On time
SHIRLEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Received: On time
GREEN COAT EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BISHOP OF SOUTHWARK'S LENT FUND
Received: On time
THE NIKAEAN ECUMENICAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL SYDENHAM, TRUST FUND
Received: On time