THE LONDON BAPTIST PROPERTY BOARD LIMITED

Charity number: 249768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 21 June 2016 On time Download