Financial history THE LONDON BAPTIST PROPERTY BOARD LIMITED

Charity number: 249768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £241.32k £275.03k £321.38k £258.67k £238.46k
Total expenditure £295.85k £264.63k £323.81k £257.03k £253.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A