AMBASSADORS FOR CHRIST

Charity number: 249782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 August 2019 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 05 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 21 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 07 September 2017 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 03 July 2017 64 days late Download