AMBASSADORS FOR CHRIST

Charity number: 249782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £46.50k £39.16k £21.37k £21.59k £13.83k
Total expenditure £49.81k £28.75k £29.45k £15.31k £11.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A