THE EXETER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE RIGHT REVEREND ROBERT ATWELL Trustee 30 April 2014
DEVON COMMUNITY FOUNDATION Received: On time
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN DEVON Received: On time
The Venerable Verena Breed Trustee 15 September 2021
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
MICHAEL STUART JEFFERIES Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
THE RIGHT REVEREND NICHOLAS HOWARD PAUL MCKINNEL Trustee 23 October 2013
SOUTH WEST MINISTRY TRAINING COURSE. Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
BLUNDELL'S SCHOOL Received: 2 days late
MEDIC MALAWI Received: 65 days late
TRANSFORMING PLYMOUTH TOGETHER Received: On time
Rev Andrew John Atkins Trustee 01 January 2022
CHARITY KNOWN AS THE THORNE CHARITY Received: On time
STEPHEN ANTHONY GEORGE MACEY Trustee 23 October 2013
CECIL COLLINGWOOD CHARITY Received: On time
Rev Jacqueline Margaret Taylor Trustee 01 September 2019
ST THOMAS OF CANTERBURY, DODBROOKE PARISH CHURCH Received: On time
The Venerable Andrew Mark Beane Trustee 25 September 2019
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
Rev Edward Quincey Hobbs Trustee 01 January 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CULLOMPTON Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
Dr MICHAEL CHARLES WYKES Trustee 01 January 2019
ST LUKES COLLEGE FOUNDATION Received: On time
MRS ANNE FOREMAN Trustee None on record
ANNIE PENELOPE JEFFERIES Trustee 25 January 2016
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
THE REVEREND CANON DR MIKE WILLIAMS Trustee 01 August 2018 None on record
THE VENERABLE DOUGLAS JAMES DETTMER Trustee None on record
GILES RICHARD FRAMPTON Chair 28 November 2015
ST LUKES COLLEGE FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE POSBURY ST FRANCIS TRUST Recently registered
The Ven Nicholas Stephen Shutt Trustee 18 June 2019
PLYMOUTH PARTNERSHIP IN MISSION Received: On time
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
PLYMOUTH CENTRE FOR FAITHS AND CULTURAL DIVERSITY Received: On time
ROBERT JOHN MILLS Trustee 01 January 2019
THE MARINE BIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM Received: On time
THE SIR ALISTER HARDY FOUNDATION FOR OCEAN SCIENCE Received: On time
The Reverend SAMANTHA MARY STAYTE Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
JULIAN NIGEL PAYNE Trustee 23 October 2013
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
PETER CULME'S GIFT Received: On time
Rev MICHAEL JOHN PARTRIDGE Trustee
THE EXETER DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
David Nigel Price Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS', HAMPTON Received: 2 days late
THE SEAMEN'S FRIENDLY SOCIETY OF ST PAUL Received: On time
THE ORDER OF ST BENEDICT AT ALTON ABBEY Received: On time
Rev Peter John March Trustee 01 January 2022 None on record
Keith David Rushforth Trustee 01 January 2022 None on record
Laura Ford Trustee 01 January 2022 None on record
The Right Reverend Jacqueline Ann Searle Trustee 14 October 2018 None on record
THE VERY REVEREND JONATHAN DESMOND FRANCIS GREENER Trustee 26 November 2017
PHILLPOTTS AND BOYD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
BOYD FOR EXHIBITIONS Received: On time
ST LUKES COLLEGE FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE MARY MARRIOTT TRUST Received: On time
DEAN AND CHAPTER OF EXETER CATHEDRAL SCHOOL PRIZE FUND Received: On time
REYNOLDS WHALE TRUST FOR ORDINANDS Received: On time
DEAN BOYD'S CHARITY FOR APPRENTICING Received: On time
FRIENDS OF WAKEFIELD CHANTRY CHAPEL Received: On time
BISHOP PHILPOTTS' AND DEAN BOYD'S CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUNDS Received: On time
REVEREND CHANCELLOR HARINGTON FOR CHORISTERS OF EXETER CATHEDRAL Received: On time
THE CARYLL WENBORN TRUST FUND Received: On time
HANNAH LOUISE DUNN Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record