Financial history THE ORDER OF FRIARS MINOR CONVENTUAL

Charity number: 249881
Charity reporting is overdue by 624 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £900.28k £3.02m £603.64k £523.19k £458.12k
Total expenditure £706.74k £951.02k £634.65k £640.23k £770.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £451.35k £2.57m £210.40k £63.45k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £281.00k £286.46k £212.96k £222.96k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £133.66k £129.12k £136.77k £187.08k N/A
Income - Other £34.27k £40.06k £43.50k £49.70k N/A
Income - Legacies £314.23k £4.88k £161.80k £1.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £646.32k £891.44k £546.50k £558.58k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £60.42k £59.58k £88.15k £81.66k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £24.96k £28.94k £30.64k £35.01k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £8.94k £9.84k £10.71k £19.42k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A