Accounts and annual returns YWCA OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 249895
Charity reporting is overdue by 153 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 153 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 153 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 February 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required