Financial history THE EQUITIES INVESTMENT FUND FOR CHARITIES (CHARIFUND)

Charity number: 249958
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £60.56m £63.17m £64.30k £43.77m £48.37m
Total expenditure £64.62m £66.46m £66.96k £51.06m £53.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £43.77m £48.37m
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £47.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £51.06m £5.05m
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £4.21m £4.47m
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0