Trustees THE EQUITIES INVESTMENT FUND FOR CHARITIES (CHARIFUND)

Charity number: 249958
Charity is a Common Investment Fund

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DESMOND SHANE SPENCER CHICHESTER Chair 05 March 2014
THE CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
GUARDS' CHAPEL TRUST
Received: On time
QUEEN'S GUARD OFFICERS' MESS
Received: On time
THE HOUSEHOLD DIVISION CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HOUSEHOLD DIVISION CHARITY
Recently registered
BIRGITTA SUSANNA BOSTROM Trustee 01 January 2017
M&G CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST FUND
Received: On time
THE CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
Alan Francis Gibbs MA Trustee 27 January 2016
M&G CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST FUND
Received: On time
M&G Securities Limited Trustee 21 July 2014
THE CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ALMSHOUSES COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
M&G MULTI-ASSET FUND FOR CHARITIES
Received: On time
M&G CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST FUND
Received: On time
NATWEST TRUSTEE AND DEPOSITARY SERVICES Trustee 25 June 2012
None on record
GEORGE ANDREW PRESCOTT Trustee 26 January 2011
M&G CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST FUND
Received: On time
NICHOLAS CHARLES TALBOT RICE Trustee 28 September 2005
M&G CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST FUND
Received: On time
M&G MULTI-ASSET FUND FOR CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
Simon Mark Corbett Trustee
VERNON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH ESTATE
Received: On time
M&G CHARIBOND CHARITIES FIXED INTEREST FUND
Received: On time
CHARITIES INVESTMENT MANAGERS LIMITED Trustee
None on record