Accounts and annual returns TREDEGAR & EBBW VALE SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS

Charity number: 249966
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 147 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 147 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 512 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 512 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 878 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 878 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1243 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1243 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1608 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1608 days