CANTERBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.15m £11.25m £10.67m £11.12m £12.52m
Total expenditure £9.94m £10.70m £10.97m £11.44m £11.27m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £25.19k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.39m N/A £175.83k
Income - Donations and legacies £8.63m £8.76m £8.97m £9.30m £10.11m
Income - Other trading activities £191.00k £522.00k £667.00k £806.00k £770.00k
Income - Charitable activities £182.00k £444.00k £415.00k £368.00k £964.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £196.00k £233.00k £306.00k £247.00k £223.00k
Income - Other £948.00k £1.29m £311.00k £398.00k £453.00k
Income - Legacies £100.00k £113.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.46m £10.43m £10.68m £11.12m £10.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £478.00k £274.00k £295.00k £325.00k £330.00k
Expenditure - Governance £20.00k £102.00k £119.00k £122.00k £121.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £788.00k £1.44m £1.34m £541.00k £1.03m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0