CANTERBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Frederick Stephenson Sibbald Trustee 20 June 2013
ASHFORD GRAMMAR SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ASHFORD TOWN Received: On time
ASHFORD GRAMMAR SCHOOL (PRIZE AND SCHOLARSHIP FUND Received: On time
Miranda Ford Trustee 18 January 2019
FRIENDS OF ST MARY OF CHARITY CHURCH, FAVERSHAM Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY OF CHARITY FAVERSHAM KENT Received: On time
FAVERSHAM ASSISTANCE CENTRE Received: On time
The Most Revd and Rt Hon JUSTIN PORTAL WELBY Trustee 20 June 2013
THE ARCHBISHOP OF CANTERBURY'S CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
LAMBETH PALACE LIBRARY TRUST FUND Received: On time
ANGLICAN CONSULTATIVE COUNCIL Overdue by 32 days
BROMLEY AND SHEPPARD'S COLLEGES CHARITY Received: On time
Felicity Louise Endacott Trustee 13 June 2019 None on record
Rev Estella Ruth Last Trustee 18 January 2019 None on record
The Right Reverend Rose Hudson-Wilkin Trustee 30 November 2019
THE TRUSTHOUSE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION Received: On time
REV CANON ANDREW WILLIAM SEWELL Trustee 20 June 2013 None on record
REV CANON DR STEPHEN HUNTER LILLICRAP Trustee 01 February 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KINGSDOWN AND CREEKSIDE IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY Received: On time
THE VERY REVEREND DR ROBERT ANDREW WILLIS Trustee
ST BENEDICT'S CENTRE Received: On time
CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL TRUST FUND Received: On time
CANTERBURY CATHEDRAL CHOIR BURSARY FUND Received: 5 days late
JESUS HOSPITAL Received: On time
Aimee Hester Joan Babbs Trustee 18 January 2019 None on record
Dr John Pedder Moss Trustee 18 January 2019
ST AUGUSTINE'S COLLEGE OF THEOLOGY LTD Received: 5 days late
SUSAN JANE ASHTON DL Trustee 13 June 2019
Together Kent Received: On time
HUGGENS' COLLEGE Received: On time
Lt Col -Retd John Peter Morrison Trustee 09 February 2019
CANTERBURY UNIT 67 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS Received: On time
CANTERBURY CHRISTIAN COUNCIL LIMITED Received: On time
Rev Carol Smith Trustee 18 January 2019
ASSOCIATION FOR PROMOTING RETREATS Received: On time
The Venerable Stephen Ronald Taylor Trustee 26 September 2012
Together Kent Received: On time
THE ST JOHN TRUST FOR THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING Overdue by 1646 days
THE APPLETON TRUST Overdue by 397 days
THE ASHFORD SCHOOL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Rev Sheila Porter Trustee 11 February 2019 None on record
The Venerable Joanne Kelly-Moore Trustee 04 March 2017
THE ST JOHN TRUST FOR THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING Overdue by 1646 days
JESUS HOSPITAL Received: On time
EASTBRIDGE HOSPITAL Received: On time
The Venrable Darren Miller Trustee 13 January 2018
ASSOCIATION OF FESTIVAL CHURCHES Recently registered