Accounts and annual returns THE MOTHERS' UNION - DIOCESE OF YORK

Charity number: 249998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 11 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window