Accounts and annual returns ST PAUL'S MONEY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 250015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window