Financial history ST PAUL'S MONEY ADVICE CENTRE

Charity number: 250015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £54.72k £47.90k £41.25k £71.72k £49.34k
Total expenditure £54.73k £44.76k £46.36k £46.65k £54.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A