Financial history THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST

Charity number: 250037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £24.42m £23.96m £19.33m £12.37m £26.88m
Total expenditure £17.26m £19.67m £19.51m £17.28m £27.98m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £193.53k £229.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £14.23m £9.06m £10.09m £6.51m £7.37m
Income - Other trading activities £2.36m £2.41m £2.44m £600.50k £956.02k
Income - Charitable activities £2.29m £2.30m £2.09m £1.79m £2.14m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.29m £1.15m £1.21m £1.09m £1.21m
Income - Other £4.26m £9.04m £3.49m £2.38m £15.20m
Income - Legacies £4.73m £714.05k £1.28m £649.73k £920.44k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.34m £17.88m £17.49m £16.00m £15.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.92m £1.79m £2.02m £1.28m £1.52m
Expenditure - Governance £138.26k £187.46k £80.32k £115.55k £268.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £187.95k £797.96k £188.38k £311.08k
Expenditure - Investment management £154.54k £152.82k £161.95k £150.12k £171.44k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £11.00m