Trustees THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST

Charity number: 250037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Rt Revd John Stanley Kenneth Arnold Chair 08 December 2014
THE ATLANTIC TRADING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE NEWMAN TRUST
Received: On time
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
ST CUTHBERT'S COLLEGE USHAW
Received: On time
GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES TOGETHER
Received: 21 days late
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN LANCASHIRE
Received: On time
Michael Dominic Devlin Trustee 27 May 2021
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
Elizabeth Therese Lilley Trustee 30 May 2019
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
Eamonn ONeal Trustee 27 February 2019
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
THE DIANNE OXBERRY TRUST
Received: On time
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
Brendan McCafferty Trustee 27 February 2019
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
Rev Michael David Jones Trustee 23 May 2018
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
Mary Hunter Trustee 30 March 2018
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
Peter Fahy Trustee 06 May 2016
CARE OF POLICE SURVIVORS
Received: On time
WE STAND TOGETHER
Received: 4 days late
1ST BRAMHALL SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
REDEEMING OUR COMMUNITIES
Received: On time
CARE OF POLICE SURVIVORS
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
BRERETON BIG LOCAL CIO
Recently registered
EDWARD NALLY Trustee 06 May 2016
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
BLACKBURN CATHOLIC YOUTH CENTRE
Overdue by 3 days
BOLTON LADS AND GIRLS CLUB LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev CHRISTOPHER DAWSON Trustee 09 May 2013
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
Rev PETER HOPKINSON Trustee 09 May 2013
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
Rev Michael Cooke Trustee 31 October 2012
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time