THE MOTHERS' UNION WINCHESTER DIOCESE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the funds and projects run by the central Mothers' Union head quarters as well as projects run within the Diocese of Winchester in order to meet the aims and objectives of the Mothers Union.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,963 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 January 1967: Standard registration
- THE MOTHERS' UNION (DIOCESE OF WINCHESTER BRANCH) (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Susan Scull | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MURPHY | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joanna Criscenti | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Hoskins | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Tickell | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.27k | £85.69k | £40.54k | £39.70k | £39.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.60k | £50.16k | £34.07k | £57.47k | £37.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 1926 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER 6/7/1974 - AMENDED BY RULES FOR OWN ORGANISATION 2001, 18 SEPTEMBER 2003, 16 MARCH 2004 AND 25 JANUARY 2007, 19 MARCH 2008 AND 9 OCTOBER 2014 as amended on 09 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO UPHOLD CHRIST'S TEACHING ON THE NATURE OF MARRIAGE AND TO PROMOTE ITS WIDER UNDERSTANDING. 2) TO ENCOURAGE PARENTS TO BRING UP THEIR CHILDREN IN THE FAITH AND LIFE OF THE CHURCH. 3) TO MAINTAIN A WORLDWIDE FELLOWSHIP OF CHRISTIANS, UNITED IN PRAYER, WORSHIP AND SERVICE. 4) TO PROMOTE CONDITIONS IN SOCIETY FAVOURABLE TO STABLE FAMILY LIFE AND FOR THE THE PROTECTION OF CHILDREN. 5) TO HELP THOSE WHOSE FAMILY LIFE HAS MET WITH ADVERSITY.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF WINCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winchester Cathedral Offices
9 The Close
WINCHESTER
SO23 9LS
- Phone:
- 07514024157
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window