GERMAN YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION IN LONDON

Charity number: 250118
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.28m £2.14m £2.15m £2.24m £2.40m
Total expenditure £2.24m £2.04m £2.16m £2.22m £2.32m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £214.99k £67.03k £46.52k £57.37k £150.05k
Income - Other trading activities £1.88m £1.89m £1.92m £1.99m £2.05m
Income - Charitable activities £16.39k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £161.37k £162.22k £167.17k £180.06k £182.44k
Income - Other £12.53k £22.70k £21.48k £13.73k £15.52k
Income - Legacies £167.89k £1.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £404.10k £943.88k £1.03m £1.05m £1.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £1.09m £1.13m £1.17m £1.28m
Expenditure - Governance £732.04k £572.24k £671.77k £708.40k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £83.24k £76.15k £66.27k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0