Financial history THE DIOCESE IN EUROPE BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 250186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.16m £1.59m £1.69m £2.22m £2.16m
Total expenditure £1.54m £1.68m £1.94m £2.07m £2.38m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £881.54k £906.04k £1.32m £1.79m £1.57m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £8.10k £0 £0 £93.87k £255.47k
Income - Endowments £100.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £359.92k £356.19k £356.19k £339.64k £324.46k
Income - Other £14.35k £13.36k £10.45k £3.47k £10.22k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.54m £1.68m £1.94m £2.07m £2.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0