Trustees THE DIOCESE IN EUROPE BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 250186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Melvin Fegan Chair 08 January 2019
None on record
Rev Richard Allen Gardiner Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
The Revd Canon Deborah Mary Rollins Flach Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Rev Richard Anthony Seabrook Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
susan Boyd Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Robin Hall Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Simon Urquhart Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Rev Robert James Warren Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Rev Geoffrey Philip Read Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Joan Berry Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Julie Ann Cole Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Miranda Kopetzky Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
Mary Gertrude Talbot Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
David Alexander Cecil Bean Trustee 07 June 2022
None on record
The Ven Dr Peter Hooper Trustee 28 November 2021
None on record
The Ven Samuel Wall Van Leer Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
Rev David Waller Trustee 16 January 2020
None on record
The Rev'd Dr. Leslie Satianathan Nathaniel Trustee 12 June 2019
None on record
Rev Madhu Smiths Prasadam Trustee 11 June 2019
None on record
Rev Tuomas Makipaa Trustee 16 June 2016
None on record
David White Trustee 01 January 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S NORTHCHURCH
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Dr Robert Innes Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
David Coulston Trustee 06 June 2013
None on record
Rt Revd David Hamid Trustee
OZANNE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ANGLICAN CENTRE IN ROME
Overdue by 221 days
THE SOCIETY OF SAINT WILLIBRORD
Received: On time