Accounts and annual returns DAME SIDNEY GROSVENOR

Charity number: 250284
Charity reporting is overdue by 1262 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
Accounts and TAR 25 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
Annual return 25 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 532 days
Accounts and TAR 25 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 532 days
Annual return 25 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 897 days
Accounts and TAR 25 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 897 days
Annual return 25 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1262 days
Accounts and TAR 25 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1262 days
Annual return 25 January 2020 29 March 2021 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 January 2020 Not Required