INSTITUTE OF CAST METALS ENGINEERS

Charity number: 250380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lee Jenkins PROF MICME Chair 05 May 2018 None on record
Trevor Ayre FICME Trustee 16 May 2015 None on record
Stephen Hill FICME Trustee 14 May 2016 None on record
Robert Bell FICME Trustee 05 May 2018 None on record
MARK SUTTON PROF MICME Trustee 20 May 2017 None on record
Trevor Stevenson FICME Trustee 10 May 2014 None on record
Lynn Postle FICME Trustee 20 May 2017 None on record
Dudley J Douglas FICME Trustee 03 December 2020 None on record
John Coughtrie FICME Trustee 03 December 2020 None on record
Keith Collins PROF MICME Trustee 05 May 2018 None on record
Martin John Dudley FICME Trustee 15 May 2021 None on record
Adam Bennett PROF MICME Trustee 13 October 2018 None on record
Simon Alexander FICME Trustee 05 May 2018 None on record
Anthony Evans FICME Trustee 05 May 2018 None on record
Anthony Sartorious FICME Trustee 13 October 2018 None on record