Accounts and annual returns YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION, WESTON-SUPER-MARE BRANCH

Charity number: 250524
Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 242 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 242 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 607 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 607 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 February 2020 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 February 2020 393 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 February 2020 736 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required