Financial history YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION, WESTON-SUPER-MARE BRANCH

Charity number: 250524
Charity reporting is overdue by 609 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A