THE BRITISH INTERPLANETARY SOCIETY

Charity number: 250556
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 31 May 2017 On time Download