MARPLE SENIOR CITIZENS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coach outings, coffee mornings, and various annual paries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockport
Governance
- 27 February 1967: Standard registration
- MARPLE OLD FOLKS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Burnhild Lazar | Chair | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Rooney | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennet Rhodes | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Page | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Sutch | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Fitzsimmons | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Farmer | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.49k | £0 | £7.99k | £15.75k | £13.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.41k | £838 | £8.56k | £18.94k | £11.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 May 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 10 SEPTEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 31 OCTOBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE, WITHIN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF MARPLE.
Area of benefit
MARPLE UD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Memorial Park Drive
Off Stockport Rd
Marple
Stockport
- Phone:
- 0161 427 3632
- Email:
- bernie.lazar@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window