Financial history INCORPORATED COUNCIL OF LAW REPORTING FOR ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity number: 250605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.90m £5.00m £5.15m £5.26m £5.43m
Total expenditure £4.69m £4.84m £4.77m £4.67m £4.87m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £60.69k £55.13k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.78m £4.88m £5.03m £5.20m £5.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £57.74k £58.60k £63.74k £53.09k £48.47k
Income - Other £0 £0 £55.50k £13.88k £37.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.69m £4.84m £4.77m £4.67m £4.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.25k £9.50k £10.45k £12.45k £14.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0