INCORPORATED COUNCIL OF LAW REPORTING FOR ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity number: 250605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Mary Margaret Malecka Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Sushila Abraham Trustee 14 September 2016
THE MAYOR'S CHARITABLE TRUST OF THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES Received: 233 days late
KINGSTON CARERS' NETWORK Received: On time
Professor James Simon Francis Lee Trustee 02 August 2021 None on record
SARAH THOMAS Trustee 19 April 2013 None on record
Alex Chalk QC MP Trustee 16 September 2021 None on record
Jamie Clarke Trustee 14 February 2019 None on record
MARGARET RUTH BOWRON QC Trustee None on record
Ingrid Stephanie Boyce Trustee 04 June 2021 None on record
JAMES MICHAEL TURNER QC Trustee None on record
RICHARD JOHN HUGO FLECK CBE Chair 19 October 2012
THE MARLBURIAN CLUB CHARITABLE FUND Received: On time
THE MARLBOROUGH COLLEGE MALAYSIA FOUNDATION Overdue by 1316 days
MELISSA LOUISE COUTINO Trustee 10 October 2018 None on record
Peter Joseph Susman QC Trustee 03 May 2016 None on record
Muhammad Faisel Sadiq Trustee 01 July 2020 None on record
SIR ALASTAIR HUBERT NORRIS Trustee 18 October 2012
THE ALASTAIR AND RACHEL NORRIS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
SIR MARK GEORGE TURNER Trustee 26 February 2013 None on record
Suella Braverman QC MP Trustee 13 February 2020 None on record
LINDA KAREN HADFIELD LEE Trustee 18 October 2016 None on record
SIR PETER MARCEL ROTH Trustee None on record
Kenneth Hamer Trustee 14 June 2016 None on record
HIS HONOUR JUDGE DAVID HODGE QC Trustee None on record