Friends of Caterham Dene Hospital

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to provide a link between the hospital and the local community and provide better amenities for patients at the hospital and in the community, including better equipment and facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Other Finance
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 January 1967: Standard registration
- 24 February 2016: Funds received from 206390 AGE CONCERN (CATERHAM AND DISTRICT AREA)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF CATERHAM DENE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERENICE CARMAN FRITH | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hetty Duck | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraint Jenkins | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Hampson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Woodland | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Hazell | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Peter Slade | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MALLERY | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY BAILEY | Trustee | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.36k | £18.08k | £16.59k | £22.48k | £31.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.94k | £29.69k | £75.06k | £15.35k | £51.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 6TH JUNE 1965 AS AMENDED 24TH JULY 1986 AND 9TH MAY 1989 AS AMENDED ON 14TH MAY 1996 as amended on 05 Jun 2019 as amended on 08 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND STAFF AND SUPPORT THE WORK OF CATERHAM DENE HOSPITAL BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE OBJECTS CLAUSE OF RULES)
Area of benefit
CATERHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH ROAD
CATERHAM
CR3 5RA
- Phone:
- 07484726708
- Email:
- treasurer@focdh.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window