THE CHARITY FOR THE RELIEF IN SICKNESS

Charity number: 251206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £36 £18 £82 £140 £113
Total expenditure £1.00k £821 £21 £586 £463
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A