BARRY YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 251245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Barry YMCA aims to provide in the communtity a meeting place where friendships and activities can be shared, which stimulates and challenges its members, in an environment that enables them to take reposibility and find a sense of achievment. It does this by offering a diverse programme of sport, education, social and play, services to its members.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Vale Of Glamorgan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 January 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION, BARRY BRANCH (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Leeves Trustee 28 March 2025
None on record
Cllr William Hennessy Trustee 26 July 2024
None on record
Cllr Howard Hamilton Trustee 20 October 2023
None on record
John Hill-Tout Trustee 26 May 2023
None on record
Kevin Ruwersma Trustee 23 September 2022
None on record
Cllr Emma Goodjohn Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Cllr Ewan Goodjohn Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Geoff Davies Trustee 10 May 2019
None on record
Stella Weston Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
LINDA RAY OWENS Trustee 12 March 1999
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £500.64k £436.52k £453.33k £586.91k £781.36k
Total expenditure £534.96k £454.91k £510.76k £576.46k £727.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £185.68k £40.50k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £9.66k N/A N/A £42.16k £97.57k
Income - Other trading activities £41.16k N/A N/A £38.26k £45.42k
Income - Charitable activities £443.34k N/A N/A £506.24k £634.31k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £19 N/A N/A £254 £4.06k
Income - Other £6.46k N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £521.42k N/A N/A £561.06k £700.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.54k N/A N/A £15.40k £27.08k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £3.06m N/A N/A £2.85m £2.87m
Long-term investments £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Other assets £74.21k N/A N/A £201.93k £235.37k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £293.74k N/A N/A £280.20k £272.45k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 15 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
YMCA
Court Road
Cadoxton
BARRY
CF63 4EE
Phone:
01446724006