CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON

Charity number: 251342
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 July 2019 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 26 July 2019 56 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 13 June 2018 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 13 June 2018 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 01 June 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 01 June 2017 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 21 June 2016 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 21 June 2016 21 days late Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)