Financial history CHARITY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESES OF SOUTHWARK AND ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON

Charity number: 251342
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £803.74k £1.43m £1.02m £1.22m £175.38k
Total expenditure £746.30k £833.94k £915.21k £958.54k £3.42m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £59.86k £14.12k
Income - Donations and legacies £7.54k £690.49k £309.78k £496.30k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £67.37k £0 £58.39k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £707.09k £626.59k £612.15k £604.49k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £23.02k £15.98k £19.24k £17.88k N/A
Income - Other £66.10k £25.74k £78.38k £44.37k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £132.21k £350.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £746.30k £833.94k £915.21k £958.54k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.52k £8.52k £9.06k £9.54k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A