TRUST FUNDS HELD IN CONNEXION WITH WEST HAGLEY FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Interdenominanational Christian Church catering for all age groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 24 July 1967: Standard registration
- HAGLEY FREE CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joan Lesley Faulkner | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE ANTHONY BATTERSBY | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dorothy Jean Stone | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cecil Geoffrey Downing | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Dewhirst | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Gardner Nisbet | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alvine Jane Walker | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Fernihough | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Johnson | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Millington | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALUN REGINALD NICHOLAS | Trustee | 02 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
BOB GREEN | Trustee | 02 August 2011 |
|
|||||
JOAN ELLIS | Trustee | 02 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
PETER LONGDEN | Trustee | 23 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN HEATHCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.90k | £53.85k | £51.62k | £63.58k | £112.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.62k | £58.72k | £66.10k | £78.32k | £90.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 December 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 December 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 December 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 December 2020 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MARCH 1912
Charitable objects
(A) TO DEFRAY EXPENSES OF THE CHURCH AND IN REPAIR, ENLARGEMENT, ALTERATION, OR IMPROVEMENT OF THE CHURCH BUILDINGS AND PREMISES. (B) TO PAY FOR THE SUPPORT OF THE MINISTRY OF THE CHURCH. (C) FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF DIVINE WORSHIP ON THE PREMISES. (D) FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE CHURCH MEMBERS MAY DIRECT.
Area of benefit
WEST HAGLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 HAWTHORN COPPICE
HAGLEY
STOURBRIDGE
DY9 0PE
- Phone:
- 01562884677
- Email:
- hfc1905@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window