THE PARISH OF SAINT JAMES COLLIER ROW AND SAINT JOHN HAVERING-ATTE-BOWER

Charity number: 251460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 July 2017 On time Download