THE PARISH OF SAINT JAMES COLLIER ROW AND SAINT JOHN HAVERING-ATTE-BOWER

Charity number: 251460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £116.26k £128.77k £127.13k £128.27k £104.75k
Total expenditure £140.73k £101.07k £114.04k £160.51k £108.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A