RSPCA EAST BERKSHIRE BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are the local Maidenhead and East Berkshire branch of the RSPCA. Our key aim is to find suitable homes for as many animals as possible and to provide proper care for those which have been mistreated or abandoned. In addition, we promote the works and objects of the National Society. We rely purely on the effort of volunteers who provide invaluable support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 24 February 1967: Standard registration
- RSPCA MAIDENHEAD AND EAST BERKSHIRE BRANCH (Working name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS MAIDENHEAD AND EAST BERKSHIRE BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA MAIDENHEAD AND EAST BERKSHIRE BRANCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Frampton | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Redman | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Ann O'Hare | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Ramsdale | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Twining-Smith | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.34k | £67.13k | £41.00k | £69.68k | £50.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.83k | £34.38k | £44.42k | £59.77k | £82.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18/02/2009 AS AMENDED ON 29/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
MAIDENHEAD AND BERKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 STATION ROAD
POLEGATE
EAST SUSSEX
BN26 6EA
- Phone:
- 07852 481 079
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window