Accounts and annual returns ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS READING WITH OXON BORDER BRANCH

Charity number: 251482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window