THE LONDON SCOTTISH HEADQUARTERS TRUST (THE HEADQUARTERS TRUST)

Charity number: 251499

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin John Felstead Trustee 28 October 2021
THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT 1995 CHARITY
THE LONDON SCOTTISH 1990 FUND (KNOWN AS THE QUEEN MOTHER'S FUND)
THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENTAL TRUST
Peter Lindsay Trustee 10 April 2019 None on record
Major Mark Desmond Randall Trustee 28 October 2021
THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT OGILBY TRUST
Marcus Victor Ormiston Trustee 28 October 2021 None on record
Air Vice-Marshal Ranald Torquil Ian Munro Trustee 01 May 2016
FIRST AID NURSING YEOMANRY (PRINCESS ROYAL'S VOLUNTEER CORPS) (FANY(PRVC)) Received: On time
THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT 1995 CHARITY
THE PARACHUTE REGIMENT AND AIRBORNE FORCES CHARITY Received: On time
THE LONDON SCOTTISH 1990 FUND (KNOWN AS THE QUEEN MOTHER'S FUND)
THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENTAL TRUST
Col Charles Stagg OBE Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Lady Rachel Johnstone-Burt Trustee 14 February 2020
THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT 1995 CHARITY
THE LONDON SCOTTISH 1990 FUND (KNOWN AS THE QUEEN MOTHER'S FUND)
THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT OGILBY TRUST
Stephen Lovelock Trustee 28 October 2021
LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT 1995 CHARITY
THE LONDON SCOTTISH 1990 FUND (KNOWN AS THE QUEEN MOTHER'S FUND)
THE LONDON SCOTTISH REGIMENT OGILBY TRUST