Financial history ELIM FOURSQUARE GOSPEL ALLIANCE

Charity number: 251549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £68.06m £70.89m £70.87m £65.94m £64.57m
Total expenditure £65.03m £66.95m £67.70m £62.95m £61.14m
Income from government contracts £1.84m £5.16m £6.59m £5.86m £4.53m
Income from government grants £64.16k £47.44k N/A £1.19m £1.40m
Income - Donations and legacies £47.87m £47.98m £48.27m £47.69m £49.58m
Income - Other trading activities £1.42m £0 £21.05m £16.90m £14.00m
Income - Charitable activities £18.97m £21.07m £700.91k £739.70k £380.15k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £44.15k £605.69k £605.89k £605.89k £605.89k
Income - Other -£249.73k £449.70k £239.45k £10.00k £0
Income - Legacies £545.32k £766.58k £420.40k £344.21k £383.05k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £63.02m £66.29m £66.97m £62.27m £59.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.33m £660.52k £731.44k £678.54k £450.28k
Expenditure - Governance £3.10m £3.28m £3.24m £1.39m £3.47m
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.02m £1.33m £347.11k £1.01m £2.60m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £677.00k £0 £0 £0 £1.28m