ELIM FOURSQUARE GOSPEL ALLIANCE

Charity number: 251549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 20 February 1967: Standard registration
  • 15 June 2012: Funds received from 1090116 POWERHOUSE CHURCH, MARCH
  • 19 October 2012: Funds received from 1115463 WOODBANK EVANGELICAL CHURCH WHITEHAVEN
  • 15 November 2012: Funds received from 1058644 PERSONAL CHOICE
  • 25 June 2014: Funds received from 514512 THE CHRISTIAN LIFE CENTRE
  • 06 October 2014: Funds received from 518763 BETHANY COMMUNITY CHURCHES
  • 07 November 2014: Funds received from 1139364 BUDE NEW LIFE CENTRE
  • 15 January 2015: Funds received from 1138818 BETHEL CHURCH (OLDBURY)
  • 07 February 2017: Funds received from 1151228 ELIM CHURCH PHEASEY TRUST
  • 05 November 2018: Funds received from 288001 HOPE TRUST WELLINGBOROUGH
  • 19 March 2019: Funds received from 1128314 KSA EDUCATION & TRAINING
  • 28 March 2019: Funds received from 1092396 ASIAN FOCUS
  • 23 April 2019: Funds received from 1109723 KETTERING PERSPECTIVE TRUST
  • 25 July 2019: Funds received from 1143927 ALLSTARS PLAYGROUP
  • 16 September 2019: Funds received from 1149021 SAFE FROM SLAVERY LTD
  • 12 January 2021: Funds received from 1107129 THE COMMUNITY CHURCH (IW)
  • 19 April 2021: Funds received from 327205 THE 40 - 3 TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ELIM (Working name)
  • ELIM CHRISTIAN CENTRE (Working name)
  • ELIM CHURCH (Working name)
  • ELIM PENTECOSTAL CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property