PENYBANC WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 251632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 March 2019 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 27 February 2017 27 days late Download