THE MELANIE KLEIN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Melanie Klein Trust organises conferences on topics connected with current developments of Klein's work and co-operates with psychoanalytic groups in the UK and abroad in organizing and supporting conferences, seminars and other teaching activities. The Trust makes available Melanie Klein's own texts and subsidises translation into other languages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 May 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR GIGLIOLA FORNARI SPOTO PHD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Elizabeth Lynn Gibb | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roberto Marongiu | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Daniel Mark Pick | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Hume | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lawrence | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helga Skogstad | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Amos | Trustee | 28 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PRISCILLA ROTH | Trustee | 19 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catalina Bronstein | Trustee | 03 February 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL FELDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.73k | £56.29k | £140.00k | £94.94k | £177.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.92k | £80.97k | £48.40k | £82.82k | £115.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2024 | 310 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 May 2024 | 310 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 July 2023 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 July 2023 | 378 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 October 2021 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 October 2021 | 117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 26 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 26 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUSTDATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1955
Charitable objects
IN OR TOWARDS THE FURTHERANCE OF THE THEORY AND TECHNIQUE OF PYSHCO-ANALYSIS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 5 OF THE TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 CAMBERWELL GROVE
LONDON
SE5 8JH
- Phone:
- 07912204138
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window